TN HB2312 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-25 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1032
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-25 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1032
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires an LEA or the department of education to provide testing materials or proposed testing materials in the LEA's or department's possession to a member of the general assembly upon the member's request to inspect and review the material; excludes certain materials. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 49, relative to the general assembly.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-25 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1032 | |
2022-04-25 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2022-04-25 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-04-20 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/25/2022 |
2022-04-19 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/20/2022 |
2022-04-18 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2022-04-13 | House | Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 4/18/2022 |
2022-04-04 | House | Reset on Final cal. of Government Operations Committee |
2022-03-30 | House | Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 4/4/2022 |
2022-03-28 | House | Action def. in Government Operations Committee to 4/4/2022 |
2022-03-23 | House | Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 3/28/2022 |
2022-03-16 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Government Operations Committee |
2022-03-09 | House | Placed on cal. Education Instruction for 3/16/2022 |
2022-03-08 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Education Instruction |
2022-03-02 | House | Placed on s/c cal Education Instruction Subcommittee for 3/8/2022 |
2022-03-01 | House | Action Def. in s/c Education Instruction Subcommittee to 3/8/2022 |
2022-02-23 | House | Placed on s/c cal Education Instruction Subcommittee for 3/1/2022 |
2022-02-15 | House | Action Def. in s/c Education Instruction Subcommittee to 3/1/2022 |
2022-02-09 | House | Placed on s/c cal Education Instruction Subcommittee for 2/15/2022 |
2022-02-07 | House | Assigned to s/c Education Instruction Subcommittee |
2022-02-03 | House | P2C, ref. to Education Instruction -- Government Operations for Review |
2022-02-02 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2022-02-01 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2299 (Crossfiled) 2022-05-25 - Effective date(s) 05/11/2022, 07/01/2022