TN SB2298 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-21 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 186
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-21 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 186
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, transfers responsibility for various functions related to drug and alcohol services from department of health to department of mental health and developmental disabilities; makes certain additional changes regarding such services. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 31.
Title
As enacted, transfers responsibility for various functions related to drug and alcohol services from department of health to department of mental health and developmental disabilities; makes certain additional changes regarding such services. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 31.
Sponsors
Sen. James Kyle [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-21 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 186 | |
2009-04-27 | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 1 - SA0117) | |
2009-04-27 | Comp. HB Subst (sends SB to dead bill file) | |
2009-04-24 | Placed on Sen. Regular Calendar (1) cal. for 04/27/2009 | |
2009-04-23 | S. Reset on cal. for 04/27/2009 | |
2009-04-22 | Placed on Sen. Regular Calendar (1) cal. for 04/23/2009 | |
2009-04-16 | Re-ref. to S. Cal. Comm. | |
2009-04-02 | S. Reset on Cal. for 4/23/2009 | |
2009-03-31 | Placed on Sen. Regular Calendar (1) cal. for 04/02/2009 | |
2009-03-25 | Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. Cal. Comm. Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 | |
2009-03-19 | Placed on S.GW,H&HR Comm. cal. for 03/25/2009 | |
2009-03-02 | P2C, ref. to S.GW,H&HR Comm. | |
2009-02-26 | Intro., P1C. | |
2009-02-26 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2250 (Crossfiled) 2009-05-21 - Pub. Ch. 186
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB2298&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/SB2298.pdf |