TN SB2297 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-04 - Pub. Ch. 639
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-04 - Pub. Ch. 639
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, names bridge on S.R. 166 in Maury County in honor of Dr. L. Paul Sands.
Title
As enacted, names bridge on S.R. 166 in Maury County in honor of Dr. L. Paul Sands.
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Ketron [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-03-12 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO CONCUR (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-05 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-01 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-25 - Senate - S. T&S COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-05 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-01 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-25 - Senate - S. T&S COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-04 | Pub. Ch. 639 | |
2012-04-04 | Effective date(s) 03/30/12 | |
2012-03-30 | Signed by Governor | |
2012-03-20 | Transmitted to Gov. for action. | |
2012-03-19 | Signed by H. Speaker | |
2012-03-15 | Signed by S. Speaker | |
2012-03-13 | Enrolled and ready for signatures | |
2012-03-12 | S. concurred in H. am. 1 | |
2012-03-08 | Placed on Senate Message Calendar cal. for 3/12/2012 | |
2012-03-05 | Passed H., as am., Ayes 93, Nays 0 | |
2012-03-05 | H. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - HA0666) | |
2012-03-05 | Subst. for comp. HB. | |
2012-02-02 | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. | |
2012-02-01 | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House | |
2012-02-01 | Passed S., Ayes 32, Nays 0 | |
2012-01-30 | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 cal. for 2/1/2012 | |
2012-01-25 | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: S. Cal. Comm. | |
2012-01-18 | Placed on S. T&S Comm. cal. for 1/25/2012 | |
2012-01-13 | P2C, ref. to S. T&S Comm. | |
2012-01-12 | Intro., P1C. | |
2012-01-11 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2587 (Crossfiled) 2012-04-04 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 639