TN SB2292 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-09 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1002
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-09 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1002
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, redefines "obscene" to include material that has educational value; makes various changes to the internet acceptable use policy LEAs are required to adopt; enacts requirements governing providers of digital and online resources; enacts and revises other related provisions. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 17 and Title 49, Chapter 1.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 39, Chapter 17 and Title 49, Chapter 1, relative to children.
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Bell [R] | Sen. Paul Bailey [R] | Sen. Janince Bowling [R] | Sen. Paul Rose [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-09 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 2 PNV 0 (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-09 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1002 | |
2022-04-22 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-04-21 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/21/2022 |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 2 PNV 0 |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/9/2022 |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/9/2022 |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/8/2022 |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/8/2022 |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/1/2022 |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2454 (Crossfiled) 2022-05-09 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2022