TN SB2291 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-28 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-28 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires executive branch employees who engage in lobbying legislative branch officials to register with the ethics commission but not pay any registration fees or the privilege tax associated with being a lobbyist. - Amends TCA Title 3, Chapter 6, Part 3.
Title
As introduced, requires executive branch employees who engage in lobbying legislative branch officials to register with the ethics commission but not pay any registration fees or the privilege tax associated with being a lobbyist. - Amends TCA Title 3, Chapter 6, Part 3.
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Bell [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/28/2018 |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/28/2018 |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/27/2018 |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2343 (Crossfiled) 2018-04-03 - Taken off notice for cal. in State Government Committee