TN SB2288 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-20 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-20 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires the owner of a firearm to report the loss or theft of the firearm to law enforcement within 48 hours of discovery of the loss or theft unless the owner is physically incapable of making a report, and to notify the law enforcement agency if the firearm is subsequently recovered; imposes a civil penalty of not more than $500 for the first violation of the reporting requirement and punishes a second or subsequent violation as a Class B misdemeanor; requires a gun dealer to inform the purchaser of a firearm of the requirement to report a lost or stolen firearm to law enforcement. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 13.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 13, relative to firearms.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-20 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2352 (Crossfiled) 2024-03-19 - Failed in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee of Criminal Justice Committee