TN SB2288 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 5 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-05 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 321
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 5 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-05 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 321
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires department of safety to maintain records concerning convictions, disqualifications, and other licensing actions involving persons who hold a commercial driver license; revises several other provisions regarding motor vehicles and motor carriers. - Amends TCA Title 5.
Title
As enacted, requires department of safety to maintain records concerning convictions, disqualifications, and other licensing actions involving persons who hold a commercial driver license; revises several other provisions regarding motor vehicles and motor carriers. - Amends TCA Title 5.
Sponsors
Sen. James Kyle [D] |
Roll Calls
2009-04-29 - Senate - S. FW&M COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-14 - Senate - S. TRANS COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. FW&M Comm. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-14 - Senate - S. TRANS COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. FW&M Comm. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-05 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 321 | |
2009-05-14 | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 1 - SA0224) | |
2009-05-14 | Comp. HB Subst (sends SB to dead bill file) | |
2009-05-12 | Placed on Sen. Regular Calendar (1) cal. for 05/14/2009 | |
2009-05-07 | S. Reset on Cal. for 5/14/2009 | |
2009-05-05 | Placed on Sen. Regular Calendar (1) cal. for 05/07/2009 | |
2009-04-29 | Rec. for pass., ref. to S. Cal. Comm. | |
2009-04-23 | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 04/29/2009 | |
2009-04-14 | Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. FW&M Comm. Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 1 | |
2009-04-09 | Placed on S. Trans Comm. cal. for 04/14/2009 | |
2009-03-02 | P2C, ref. to S. Trans Comm. | |
2009-02-26 | Intro., P1C. | |
2009-02-26 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2330 (Crossfiled) 2009-06-05 - Pub. Ch. 321