TN SB2258 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-23 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1040
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, revises various provisions of law regarding the scheduling of controlled substances and their analogues and derivatives, including updated identifications of drugs categorized in Schedules I–V; authorizes sentence reduction credits for prisoners who successfully complete intensive substance use disorder treatment program. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 4; Title 41, Chapter 21, Part 2; Title 53 and Title 63.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, revises various provisions of law regarding the scheduling of controlled substances and their analogues and derivatives, including updated identifications of drugs categorized in Schedules I–V; authorizes sentence reduction credits for prisoners who successfully complete intensive substance use disorder treatment program. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 4; Title 41, Chapter 21, Part 2; Title 53 and Title 63.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-23 Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1040
2018-04-18SenateCompanion House Bill substituted
2018-04-17SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/18/2018
2018-04-17SenateSenate Reset on calendar 4/18/18
2018-04-16SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/17/2018
2018-04-16SenateSenate Reset on calendar 4/17/18
2018-04-12SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/16/2018
2018-03-06SenateRecommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
2018-02-28SenatePlaced on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 3/6/2018
2018-02-28SenateRecommended for passage, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2018-02-28SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 2/28/2018
2018-02-27SenateAction deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 2/28/2018
2018-02-21SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 2/27/2018
2018-02-20SenateAction deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 2/27/2018
2018-02-14SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 2/20/2018
2018-02-05SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
2018-02-01SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2018-01-31SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB1832 (Crossfiled) 2018-05-23 - Pub. Ch. 1040

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback