TN HB1832 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-23 - Pub. Ch. 1040
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, revises various provisions of law regarding the scheduling of controlled substances and their analogues and derivatives, including updated identifications of drugs categorized in Schedules I–V; authorizes sentence reduction credits for prisoners who successfully complete intensive substance use disorder treatment program. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 4; Title 41, Chapter 21, Part 2; Title 53 and Title 63.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, revises various provisions of law regarding the scheduling of controlled substances and their analogues and derivatives, including updated identifications of drugs categorized in Schedules I–V; authorizes sentence reduction credits for prisoners who successfully complete intensive substance use disorder treatment program. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 4; Title 41, Chapter 21, Part 2; Title 53 and Title 63.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-25 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt Conference Committee Report (Y: 25 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-25 - House - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT CONFERENCE COMMITTEE REPORT (Y: 86 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-23 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENT # 2 (Y: 35 N: 53 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-18 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-18 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Lay on the Table Amend# 3 by Green (Y: 17 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-18 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt Amend# 2 by Yager (Y: 16 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-09 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-23 Pub. Ch. 1040
2018-05-23 Effective date(s) 07/01/2018
2018-05-21 Signed by Governor.
2018-05-10HouseTransmitted to Governor for his action.
2018-05-09SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2018-05-02HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2018-04-30HouseEnrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
2018-04-25SenateConference Committee report adopted, Ayes 25, Nays 2, PNV 1
2018-04-25HouseConf. comm. report adopted, Ayes 86, Nays 2 PNV 0
2018-04-24HouseH. Placed on Message Calendar for 4/25/2018
2018-04-24SenateConference Committee appointed. (Norris, Yager, Tate)
2018-04-24HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2018-04-24HouseConf. comm. appointed. (Dunn, Casada, Stewart)
2018-04-24HouseH. refused to recede from am. no. 2 HB1832
2018-04-24HouseH. Placed on Message Calendar #2 for 4/24/2018
2018-04-24SenateSenate refused to recede from amendment 2
2018-04-24SenatePlaced on Senate Message Calendar 2 calendar for 4/24/2018
2018-04-23HouseH. nonconcurred in S. am. no. 1 HB1832
2018-04-23HouseMotion to concur in S. am. no. 1 failed Ayes 35, Nays 53 PNV 5 HB1832
2018-04-23HouseSponsor(s) withdrawn.
2018-04-19HouseH. Placed on Message Calendar for 4/23/2018
2018-04-19HouseReset on cal. for 4/23/2018
2018-04-18HouseH. Placed on Message Calendar for 4/19/2018
2018-04-18SenatePassed Senate as amended, Ayes 27, Nays 2
2018-04-18SenateAmendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0748)
2018-04-18SenateAmendment tabled (Amendment 3 - SA1103)
2018-04-18SenateSenate adopted Amendment (Amendment 2 - SA1102)
2018-04-18SenateSenate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill.
2018-04-11SenateReceived from House, Passed on First Consideration
2018-04-10HouseEngrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
2018-04-09HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2018-04-09HousePassed H., as am., Ayes 95, Nays 1, PNV 0
2018-04-09HouseH. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0808)
2018-04-05HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/9/2018
2018-04-04HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/5/2018
2018-04-03HouseRec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
2018-03-28HousePlaced on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 4/3/2018
2018-03-28HouseRec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
2018-03-21HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/28/2018
2018-03-21HouseAssigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee
2018-03-16HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2018-03-13HouseRec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
2018-03-12HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2018-03-07HousePlaced on cal. Health Committee for 3/13/2018
2018-03-07HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Health Committee
2018-03-01HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2018-02-28HousePlaced on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 3/7/2018
2018-02-28HouseAction def. in Criminal Justice Committee to 3/7/2018
2018-02-27HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2018-02-21HousePlaced on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 2/28/2018
2018-02-21HouseAction def. in Criminal Justice Committee to 2/28/2018
2018-02-14HousePlaced on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 2/21/2018
2018-02-13HouseRec. for pass by s/c ref. to Criminal Justice Committee
2018-02-07HousePlaced on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 2/13/2018
2018-01-31HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2018-01-30HouseAssigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee
2018-01-25HouseP2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee-- Health
2018-01-24HouseIntro., P1C.
2018-01-23HouseFiled for intro.

Same As/Similar To

SB2258 (Crossfiled) 2018-05-23 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1040

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback