TN SB2252 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-03 - Action deferred in Senate Education Committee to 12/1/2020
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-03 - Action deferred in Senate Education Committee to 12/1/2020
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, enacts the "Teacher's Discipline Act"; establishes a disciplinary process for students who have been removed from the classroom by the teacher. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Title
As introduced, enacts the "Teacher's Discipline Act"; establishes a disciplinary process for students who have been removed from the classroom by the teacher. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-03 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Education Committee to 12/1/2020 |
2020-05-27 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 6/3/2020 |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Education Committee |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/16/2020 |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2134 (Crossfiled) 2020-06-08 - Received from House, Passed on First Consideration