TN SB2244 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-19 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-19 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, creates the Class E felony of a person possessing a motor vehicle with a compartment for the storage of contraband with the intent to store or transport contraband, and the Class C felony of facilitating the transportation of contraband by designing, installing, or constructing a compartment. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 10, Part 2.
Title
As introduced, creates the Class E felony of a person possessing a motor vehicle with a compartment for the storage of contraband with the intent to store or transport contraband, and the Class C felony of facilitating the transportation of contraband by designing, installing, or constructing a compartment. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 10, Part 2.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-22 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-19 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2016-04-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/19/2016 |
2016-04-18 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/19/2016 |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/18/2016 |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/18/2016 |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee3 calendar for 4/13/2016 |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/13/2016 |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee3 calendar for 4/12/2016 |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/22/2016 |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1455 (Crossfiled) 2016-04-18 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee