TN SB2216 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-10 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-10 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, revises various provisions of the Tennessee Sports Gaming Act. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 14; Title 38; Title 39; Title 47; Title 49 and Title 67.
Title
As introduced, revises various provisions of the Tennessee Sports Gaming Act. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 14; Title 38; Title 39; Title 47; Title 49 and Title 67.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-10 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2844 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-28 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee of State Committee