TN SB2212 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-03 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-03 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires BEP funding formula to fund one full-time school social worker position for each 250 students or one full-time position for each LEA, whichever is greater. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 3, Part 3.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 49, Chapter 3, Part 3, relative to school personnel.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-03 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2297 (Crossfiled) 2022-02-07 - Assigned to s/c K-12 Subcommittee