TN SB2202 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-07 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Health & Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-07 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Health & Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, permits the commissioner of human services to submit the required annual report on annual adjustments to the standard of need for the Families First Act of 1996 to the governor and the general assembly in electronic format. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 3 and Title 71.
Title
As introduced, permits the commissioner of human services to submit the required annual report on annual adjustments to the standard of need for the Families First Act of 1996 to the governor and the general assembly in electronic format. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 3 and Title 71.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-07 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Health & Welfare Committee |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Reset on Final calendar of Senate Health and Welfare Committee |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 2/17/2016 |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2599 (Crossfiled) 2016-01-27 - Assigned to s/c Health Subcommittee
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB2202&ga=109 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/109/Bill/SB2202.pdf |