TN SB2200 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-20 - Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 3/27/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-20 - Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 3/27/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, revises provisions governing placement of child outside the care of the child's parent or guardian by a court order as grounds for the initiation of the termination of parental rights. - Amends TCA Section 36-1-113.
Title
As introduced, revises provisions governing placement of child outside the care of the child's parent or guardian by a court order as grounds for the initiation of the termination of parental rights. - Amends TCA Section 36-1-113.
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Norris [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-20 | Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 3/27/2012 | |
2012-03-14 | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 3/20/2012 | |
2012-03-13 | Action Def. in S. Jud. Comm. to 3/20/12 | |
2012-03-07 | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 3/13/2012 | |
2012-03-06 | Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 3/13/2012 | |
2012-02-29 | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 3/6/2012 | |
2012-02-28 | Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 3/6/2012 | |
2012-02-22 | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 2/28/2012 | |
2012-02-21 | Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 2/28/2012 | |
2012-02-15 | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 2/21/2012 | |
2012-01-13 | P2C, ref. to S. Jud Comm. | |
2012-01-12 | Intro., P1C. | |
2012-01-10 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2338 (Crossfiled) 2012-04-04 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in: Children and Family Affairs Committee
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB2200&ga=107 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/107/Bill/SB2200.pdf |