TN SB2182 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 25 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-29 - Transmitted to Governor for action.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on April 25 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-29 - Transmitted to Governor for action.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, specifies that the required notice of a public meeting by an industrial development corporation related to the approval of a payment in lieu of taxes for a lessee of the corporation must be published on the website of the corporation. - Amends TCA Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 13 and Title 48.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 13 and Title 48, relative to the development of housing.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-23 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 91 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-10 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-02 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 11, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-20 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-10 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-02 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 11, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-20 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-29 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2024-04-26 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2024-04-25 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2024-04-25 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2024-04-23 | House | Passed H., Ayes 91, Nays 4, PNV 0 |
2024-04-23 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 2 - HA0906) |
2024-04-23 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0902) |
2024-04-23 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2024-04-15 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 29, Nays 0 |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 2 - SA0934) |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0830) |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/10/2024 |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 11, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/2/2024 |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/20/2024 |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/20/2024 |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/19/2024 |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2797 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-23 - Comp. SB subst.