TN SB2180 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 894
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 894
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, enacts the "Transparency in Higher Education Act, which requires each state institution of higher education to notify parents of enrolled students of the parent's right to view student records under the federal Family Educational Rights and Privacy Act of 1974 on the institution's website. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Title
As enacted, enacts the "Transparency in Higher Education Act, which requires each state institution of higher education to notify parents of enrolled students of the parent's right to view student records under the federal Family Educational Rights and Privacy Act of 1974 on the institution's website. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-28 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/ amendments, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-08 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 894 | |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/17/2018 |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar 4/17/18 |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/16/2018 |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar 4/16/18 |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/12/2018 |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/28/2018 |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Education Committee to 3/28/2018 |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/21/2018 |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2230 (Crossfiled) 2018-05-08 - Pub. Ch. 894