TN SB2161 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-02 - Pub. Ch. 689
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-02 - Pub. Ch. 689
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, authorizes the department to require its employees and contractors who have elevated and privileged access to data and personal information to submit to a background check to be performed by the TBI as a condition of employment. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 3.
Title
As enacted, authorizes the department to require its employees and contractors who have elevated and privileged access to data and personal information to submit to a background check to be performed by the TBI as a condition of employment. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 3.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-01 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-02 | Pub. Ch. 689 | |
2020-07-02 | Effective date(s) 06/11/2020 | |
2020-06-11 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2020-06-04 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2020-06-03 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2020-06-03 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2020-06-02 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2020-06-01 | House | Passed H., Ayes 93, Nays 0, PNV 1 |
2020-06-01 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2020-02-27 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 30, Nays 0 |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 2/24/2020 |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 2/18/2020 |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2230 (Crossfiled) 2020-07-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 689