TN SB2159 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 26-3)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Pub. Ch. 918
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, directs the state capitol commission, subject to funding from nonstate sources, to place a POW-MIA Chair of Honor on the capitol grounds.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, directs the state capitol commission, subject to funding from nonstate sources, to place a POW-MIA Chair of Honor on the capitol grounds.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-17 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-29 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-13 - Senate - SENATE STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-08 Pub. Ch. 918
2018-05-08 Effective date(s) 05/01/2018
2018-05-01SenateSigned by Governor.
2018-04-23SenateTransmitted to Governor for action.
2018-04-19HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2018-04-19SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2018-04-18SenateEnrolled and ready for signatures
2018-04-17HousePassed H., Ayes 97, Nays 0, PNV 0
2018-04-17HouseAm. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0868)
2018-04-17HouseSubst. for comp. HB.
2018-04-02HouseRcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
2018-03-29SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2018-03-29SenateSponsor(s) Added.
2018-03-29SenatePassed Senate as amended, Ayes 27, Nays 0
2018-03-29SenateSenate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0778)
2018-03-28SenateSponsor(s) Added.
2018-03-28SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 3/29/2018
2018-03-28SenateSenate Reset on calendar for 3/29/2018
2018-03-26SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 3/28/2018
2018-03-13SenateRecommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0
2018-03-07SenatePlaced on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/13/2018
2018-03-06SenateAction deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/13/2018
2018-02-28SenatePlaced on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/6/2018
2018-02-05SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
2018-02-01SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2018-01-31SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB2138 (Crossfiled) 2018-05-08 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 918

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback