TN SB2153 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-08 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-08 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, authorizes a member of a homeowners' association for a neighborhood in Williamson County with at least 300 single family residential homes and two or more gates restricting ingress and egress to the neighborhood to request a report from the board of directors for the homeowners' association regarding criminal activity in the gated subdivision; requires the board to compile the report and make it available to each household in the subdivision. - Amends TCA Title 66, Chapter 27.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 66, Chapter 27, relative to gated communities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-22 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - Senate - SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - Senate - SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-08 | Effective date(s) 07/01/2024 | |
2024-04-08 | Pub. Ch. 645 | |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2024-03-26 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2024-03-18 | House | Passed H., Ayes 94, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2024-03-18 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2024-02-26 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 33, Nays 0 |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 2/22/2024 |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 2/13/2024 |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-01-29 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2612 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-08 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 645