TN HB2612 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-08 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 645
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-08 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 645
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, authorizes a member of a homeowners' association for a neighborhood in Williamson County with at least 300 single family residential homes and two or more gates restricting ingress and egress to the neighborhood to request a report from the board of directors for the homeowners' association regarding criminal activity in the gated subdivision; requires the board to compile the report and make it available to each household in the subdivision. - Amends TCA Title 66, Chapter 27.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 66, Chapter 27, relative to gated communities.
Sponsors
Rep. Gino Bulso [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-18 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-08 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 645 | |
2024-03-18 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2024-03-14 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 3/18/2024 |
2024-03-13 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/14/2024 |
2024-03-12 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2024-03-06 | House | Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 3/12/2024 |
2024-03-06 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Local Government Committee |
2024-02-28 | House | Placed on s/c cal Property & Planning Subcommittee for 3/6/2024 |
2024-02-07 | House | Assigned to s/c Property & Planning Subcommittee |
2024-02-05 | House | P2C, ref. to Local Government Committee |
2024-02-01 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2024-01-31 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2153 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-08 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2024