TN SB2152 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-13 - Effective date(s) 04/08/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-13 - Effective date(s) 04/08/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, allows the retirement system to procure goods and services for a pension administration system that may replace the system currently in existence, subject to appropriation made in the general appropriations act. - Amends TCA Title 8, Chapter 34, Part 3.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 8, Chapter 34, Part 3, relative to administration of the retirement system.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-21 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-13 | Effective date(s) 04/08/2022 | |
2022-04-13 | Pub. Ch. 780 | |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2022-03-28 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2022-03-21 | House | Passed H., Ayes 88, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2022-03-21 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2022-03-10 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 3/7/2022 |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/1/2022 |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2273 (Crossfiled) 2022-04-13 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 780