TN SB2149 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-26 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
Pending: Senate Finance, Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-26 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
Pending: Senate Finance, Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires the department of safety to create a voucher program for the purpose of providing a handgun safety course to purchasers of handguns at no cost to the handgun purchaser; limits the value of the voucher to $30. - Amends TCA Title 4 and Title 39.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4 and Title 39, relative to a handgun safety course.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-22 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 8, Nays 1 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-26 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2022-04-21 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/26/2022 |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/26/2022 |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/19/2022 |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/19/2022 |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/12/2022 |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 8, Nays 1 PNV 0 |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/22/2022 |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/8/2022 |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2850 (Crossfiled) 2022-04-26 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways, and Means Committee