TN SB2145 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-01 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-01 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires incorporators of a corporation to provide at least five days' notice, rather than two days' notice, before holding an organizational meeting to elect directors or a board of directors to complete the organization of the corporation if initial directors are not named in the charter. - Amends TCA Title 29 and Title 48.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 29 and Title 48, relative to business entities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-01 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-01-29 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2626 (Crossfiled) 2024-02-05 - P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.