TN SB2140 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-02 - Pub. Ch. 727
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-02 - Pub. Ch. 727
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, repeals the Tennessee Egg Law, which establishes a licensure system for certain persons who buy, sell, trade, traffic, or process eggs in Tennessee. - Amends TCA Section 43-1-701; Title 53, Chapter 1, Part 2 and Title 53, Chapter 2.
Title
As enacted, repeals the Tennessee Egg Law, which establishes a licensure system for certain persons who buy, sell, trade, traffic, or process eggs in Tennessee. - Amends TCA Section 43-1-701; Title 53, Chapter 1, Part 2 and Title 53, Chapter 2.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-09 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - SENATE ENERGY, AGRICULTURE AND NATURAL RESOURCES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - SENATE ENERGY, AGRICULTURE AND NATURAL RESOURCES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-02 | Pub. Ch. 727 | |
2020-07-02 | Effective date(s) 06/22/2020 | |
2020-06-22 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2020-06-11 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2020-06-11 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2020-06-11 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2020-06-11 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2020-06-09 | House | Passed H., Ayes 92, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2020-06-09 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2020-03-05 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 3/2/2020 |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee calendar for 2/26/2020 |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2209 (Crossfiled) 2020-07-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 727