TN SB2120 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-15 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 902
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-15 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 902
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, revises certain provisions regarding tort actions and damages. - Amends TCA Title 20; Title 27; Title 29 and Title 47.
Title
As enacted, revises certain provisions regarding tort actions and damages. - Amends TCA Title 20; Title 27; Title 29 and Title 47.
Sponsors
Sen. Tim Barnes [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-04-11 - Senate - S. JUD COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-15 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 902 | |
2012-04-19 | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 1 - SA1216) | |
2012-04-19 | Comp. HB Subst (sends SB to dead bill file) | |
2012-04-17 | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 4/19/2012 | |
2012-04-11 | Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. Cal. Comm. Ayes 6, Nays 1 PNV 1 | |
2012-04-11 | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 4/11/2012 | |
2012-04-10 | Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 4/11/2012 | |
2012-04-04 | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 4/10/2012 | |
2012-01-12 | P2C, ref. to S. Jud Comm. | |
2012-01-10 | Intro., P1C. | |
2011-05-21 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2161 (Crossfiled) 2012-06-15 - Pub. Ch. 902