TN HB2161 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 15 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-15 - Pub. Ch. 902
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 15 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-15 - Pub. Ch. 902
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, revises certain provisions regarding tort actions and damages. - Amends TCA Title 20; Title 27; Title 29 and Title 47.
Title
As enacted, revises certain provisions regarding tort actions and damages. - Amends TCA Title 20; Title 27; Title 29 and Title 47.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-19 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-16 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-16 - House - FLOOR VOTE: LAY ON THE TABLE MOTION TO ADOPT AMENDMENT # 2 BY Richardson PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 64 N: 28 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Regular Calendar 1 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-07 - House - (VOICE VOTE) JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-01-25 - House - (VOICE VOTE) JUDICIARY SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Judiciary Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-16 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-16 - House - FLOOR VOTE: LAY ON THE TABLE MOTION TO ADOPT AMENDMENT # 2 BY Richardson PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 64 N: 28 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Regular Calendar 1 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-07 - House - (VOICE VOTE) JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-01-25 - House - (VOICE VOTE) JUDICIARY SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Judiciary Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-15 | Pub. Ch. 902 | |
2012-06-15 | Effective date(s) 06/12/12 | |
2012-06-12 | Signed by Governor. | |
2012-06-01 | Transmitted to Governor for his action. | |
2012-05-31 | Signed by S. Speaker | |
2012-05-30 | Signed by H. Speaker | |
2012-05-29 | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. | |
2012-05-09 | Signed by Governor. | |
2012-04-27 | Transmitted to Governor for his action. | |
2012-04-24 | Signed by S. Speaker | |
2012-04-23 | Signed by H. Speaker | |
2012-04-20 | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. | |
2012-04-19 | Passed S., Ayes 27, Nays 3 | |
2012-04-19 | S. Subst. HB for comp. SB. | |
2012-02-23 | Rcvd. from H., P1C. | |
2012-02-16 | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. | |
2012-02-16 | Passed H., as am., Ayes 97, Nays 0 | |
2012-02-16 | H. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - HA0682) | |
2012-02-14 | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 2/16/2012 | |
2012-02-09 | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 2/14/2012 | |
2012-02-07 | Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee | |
2012-02-01 | Placed on cal. Judiciary Committee for 2/7/2012 | |
2012-01-25 | Rec. for pass. if am. by s/c ref. to Judiciary Committee | |
2012-01-18 | Placed on s/c cal Judiciary Subcommittee for 1/25/2012 | |
2012-01-18 | Assigned to s/c Judiciary Subcommittee | |
2012-01-12 | P2C, ref. to Judiciary Committee | |
2012-01-10 | Intro., P1C. | |
2011-05-21 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2120 (Crossfiled) 2012-05-15 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 902