TN SB2100 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-01 - Effective date(s) 10/01/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-01 - Effective date(s) 10/01/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, authorizes the use of certain third-party examiners, inspectors, engineers, and professionals in lieu of a local or state examiner, inspector, engineer, or professional for certain permitted processes and requirements; establishes procedures and requirements for the use of a third-party examiner, inspector, engineer, or professional. - Amends TCA Title 68, Chapter 120; Title 68, Chapter 221 and Title 69, Chapter 3, Part 1.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 68, Chapter 120; Title 68, Chapter 221 and Title 69, Chapter 3, Part 1, relative to permitting.
Sponsors
Sen. Jack Johnson [R] | Sen. John Stevens [R] | Sen. Bill Powers [R] | Sen. Brent Taylor [R] |
Sen. Ferrell Haile [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-08 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Concur House Amendment # 1 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-28 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 83 N: 2 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-04 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - Senate - SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 1 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-28 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 83 N: 2 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-04 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - Senate - SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 1 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-01 | Effective date(s) 10/01/2024 | |
2024-05-01 | Pub. Ch. 771 | |
2024-04-23 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2024-04-11 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Concurred, Ayes 28, Nays 0, PNV 3 (Amendment 1 - HA0749) |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Placed on Senate Message Calendar for 4/8/2024 |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 4/8/2024 |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Placed on Senate Message Calendar for 4/4/2024 |
2024-03-28 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 83, Nays 2, PNV 6 |
2024-03-28 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0749) |
2024-03-28 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2024-03-07 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 27, Nays 4 |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 2 - SA0598) |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0551) |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 3/4/2024 |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 3/4/2024 |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 3/4/2024 |
2024-02-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 2/26/2024 |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 1 |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 2/20/2024 |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to 2/20/2024 |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 2/13/2024 |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-01-29 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1892 (Crossfiled) 2024-05-01 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 771