TN SB2092 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-08 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-08 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, prohibits youth development centers, jailers, and the department of correction from assessing against a juvenile offender charges for making local telephone calls. - Amends TCA Title 37 and Title 41.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 37 and Title 41, relative to telephone calls.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-08 | Senate | Withdrawn. |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Recalled from Senate State & Local Government Committee |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2022-01-28 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB2092&ga=112 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/112/Bill/SB2092.pdf |