TN SB2092 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-24 - Re-ref. to S. Cal. Comm.
Pending: Senate Calendar Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-24 - Re-ref. to S. Cal. Comm.
Pending: Senate Calendar Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, provides that any person honorably discharged from any branch of the United States armed forces, who is on active duty in any branch of the armed forces or who is currently serving in the national guard or armed forces reserve who makes initial application for a handgun carry permit only has to pay that portion of the initial application fee that is necessary to conduct the required criminal history record checks. - Amends TCA Section 39-17-1351.
Title
As introduced, provides that any person honorably discharged from any branch of the United States armed forces, who is on active duty in any branch of the armed forces or who is currently serving in the national guard or armed forces reserve who makes initial application for a handgun carry permit only has to pay that portion of the initial application fee that is necessary to conduct the required criminal history record checks. - Amends TCA Section 39-17-1351.
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Green [R] | Rep. Tilman Goins [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-18 - Senate - S. JUD COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-24 | Senate | Re-ref. to S. Cal. Comm. |
2014-03-21 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 cal. for 3/24/2014 |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: S. Cal. Comm. |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 3/18/2014 |
2014-01-29 | Senate | P2C, ref. to S. Jud Comm. |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Intro., P1C. |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1927 (Crossfiled) 2014-03-19 - Failed In s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee of Civil Justice Committee