TN SB2088 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-03-11 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S.GW,H&HR Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-03-11 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S.GW,H&HR Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, revises accrediting agency for social worker programs to include colleges and universities approved by the board of social workers. - Amends TCA Title 63, Chapter 23, Part 1.
Title
As introduced, revises accrediting agency for social worker programs to include colleges and universities approved by the board of social workers. - Amends TCA Title 63, Chapter 23, Part 1.
Sponsors
Sen. Mae Beavers [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-11 | Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S.GW,H&HR Comm. | |
2009-03-04 | Placed on S.GW,H&HR Comm. cal. for 03/11/2009 | |
2009-02-26 | P2C, ref. to S.GW,H&HR Comm. | |
2009-02-25 | Intro., P1C. | |
2009-02-25 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2053 (Crossfiled) 2009-03-11 - Assigned to s/c Professional Occupations of HHR
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB2088&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/SB2088.pdf |