TN SB2086 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-06 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce & Labor Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-06 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce & Labor Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, adds to those receiving the TACIR report on the impact of the Competitive Wireless Broadband Investment, Deployment, and Safety Act of 2018 by January 1, 2021, the speaker of the senate and the speaker of the house of representatives. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 7; Title 13; Title 65 and Title 66.
Title
As introduced, adds to those receiving the TACIR report on the impact of the Competitive Wireless Broadband Investment, Deployment, and Safety Act of 2018 by January 1, 2021, the speaker of the senate and the speaker of the house of representatives. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 7; Title 13; Title 65 and Title 66.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-06 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce & Labor Committee |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2318 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-06 - P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.