TN SB2085 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-29 - Failed in Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-29 - Failed in Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, expands the offenses of assault and aggravated assault against a first responder or nurse to include offenses committed against any licensed emergency healthcare provider; increases the mandatory minimum period of incarceration for each offense; increases the penalty for an aggravated assault against a first responder or other licensed emergency healthcare provider to a Class A felony with a minimum mandatory sentence of 15 years. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 13, Part 1.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 39, Chapter 13, Part 1, relative to assault.
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Rose [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-29 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Failed in Senate Judiciary Committee (Y: 2 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-29 | Senate | Failed in Senate Judiciary Committee |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/29/2022 |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/29/2022 |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/22/2022 |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/22/2022 |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/16/2022 |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/16/2022 |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/15/2022 |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2247 (Crossfiled) 2022-03-30 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways, and Means Committee