TN SB2074 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-22 - Pub. Ch. 718
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-22 - Pub. Ch. 718
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, permits the commissioner of revenue to delegate certain duties to the county clerks relative to the taxation, titling, registration, and regulation of motor vehicles. - Amends TCA Title 55.
Title
As enacted, permits the commissioner of revenue to delegate certain duties to the county clerks relative to the taxation, titling, registration, and regulation of motor vehicles. - Amends TCA Title 55.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-31 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-17 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - Senate - S. TRANS & SAFETY COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-17 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - Senate - S. TRANS & SAFETY COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-22 | House | Pub. Ch. 718 |
2014-04-22 | House | Effective date(s) 04/16/2014 |
2014-04-16 | House | Signed by Governor. |
2014-04-07 | House | Transmitted to Gov. for action. |
2014-04-02 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2014-04-02 | House | Signed by S. Speaker |
2014-04-01 | House | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2014-03-31 | House | Passed H., Ayes 95, Nays 0 |
2014-03-31 | House | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 1 - HA0987) |
2014-03-31 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Passed S. as am., Ayes 30, Nays 0 |
2014-03-17 | Senate | S. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - SA0772) |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 3/17/2014 |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. Cal. Comm. Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Placed on S. Trans & Safety Comm. cal. for 3/12/2014 |
2014-01-29 | Senate | P2C, ref. to S. Trans & Safety Comm. |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Intro., P1C. |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2309 (Crossfiled) 2014-04-22 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 718