TN SB2065 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-05 - Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-05 - Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, directs TACIR to study the cost, feasibility, and infrastructure of expanding railroad passenger service in this state through the National Railroad Passenger Corporation, doing business as Amtrak. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 10; Title 4, Chapter 23; Title 64 and Title 65.
Title
As introduced, directs TACIR to study the cost, feasibility, and infrastructure of expanding railroad passenger service in this state through the National Railroad Passenger Corporation, doing business as Amtrak. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 10; Title 4, Chapter 23; Title 64 and Title 65.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-02 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - TRANSPORTATION AND SAFETY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - TRANSPORTATION AND SAFETY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-05 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 30, Nays 0 |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0522) |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 3/2/2020 |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate Transportation and Safety Committee calendar for 2/26/2020 |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Transportation and Safety Committee to 2/26/2020 |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate Transportation and Safety Committee calendar for 2/19/2020 |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Transportation and Safety Committee |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1712 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-27 - Reset on Final cal. of Calendar & Rules Committee