TN SB2064 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 28 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-28 - Failed in Senate Health and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 28 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-28 - Failed in Senate Health and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, expands eligibility for the Smart Steps child care payment assistance program for parents or guardians whose income is less than 100 percent of the state median income; requires the payments to be funded by state funds. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 9 and Title 71.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4; Title 9 and Title 71, relative to financial assistance for child care.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-28 - Senate - SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Failed in Senate Health and Welfare Committee (Y: 3 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-28 | Senate | Failed in Senate Health and Welfare Committee |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 2/28/2024 |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Health and Welfare Committee to 2/28/2024 |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 2/21/2024 |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee |
2024-01-29 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-01-26 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2233 (Crossfiled) 2024-03-13 - Taken off notice for cal. in Health Committee