TN SB2056 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-04 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 937
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-04 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 937
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, expands the definition of severe child sexual abuse for purposes of termination of parental rights and giving a parent standing to file a petition to terminate the parental rights of the abusive parent; declares all adoption records to be a public record when 100 years have elapsed since the date the adoption was finalized; makes various other changes in regard to termination of parental rights and adoption. - Amends TCA Title 10, Chapter 7, Part 5; Title 36; Title 37 and Title 68.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 10, Chapter 7, Part 5; Title 36; Title 37 and Title 68, relative to children.
Sponsors
Sen. Ferrell Haile [R] | Sen. Paul Rose [R] | Sen. Page Walley [R] | Sen. Dawn White [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-22 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 6, Nays 2 PNV 0 (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-04 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 937 | |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 3/31/2022 |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 6, Nays 2 PNV 0 |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/22/2022 |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Re-refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 3/10/2022 |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/1/2022 |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/1/2022 |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 2/22/2022 |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2070 (Crossfiled) 2022-05-04 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2022