TN SB2054 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-16 - Companion House Bill substituted
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, requires each elected constable to complete 40 hours of in-service course time every 12 months in office rather than completing 40 hours of course time within 12 months of a constable's election. - Amends TCA Section 8-10-202.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, requires each elected constable to complete 40 hours of in-service course time every 12 months in office rather than completing 40 hours of course time within 12 months of a constable's election. - Amends TCA Section 8-10-202.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-16SenateCompanion House Bill substituted
2018-04-12SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/16/2018
2018-04-12SenateSenate Reset on calendar 4/16/18
2018-04-11SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/12/2018
2018-04-11SenateSenate Reset on calendar for 4/12/2018
2018-04-06SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/11/2018
2018-04-04SenateSenate Reset on calendar for 4/11/2018
2018-04-02SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/4/2018
2018-03-20SenateRecommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 6, Nays 0 PNV 2
2018-03-14SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/20/2018
2018-02-27SenateAssigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee
2018-02-21SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 2/27/2018
2018-02-21SenateAction deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 2/28/2018
2018-02-21SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 2/21/2018
2018-02-20SenateAction deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 2/21/2018
2018-02-14SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 2/20/2018
2018-02-01SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
2018-01-31SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2018-01-30SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB2141 (Crossfiled) 2018-04-19 - Placed on Senate Message Calendar calendar for 4/23/2018

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback