TN SB2043 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Pub. Ch. 915
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Pub. Ch. 915
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, authorizes the board of commissioners of utility district in Blountville to increase the pay for each commissioner per meeting from $300 to $350 by resolution of the board. - Amends TCA Title 7, Chapter 82.
Title
As enacted, authorizes the board of commissioners of utility district in Blountville to increase the pay for each commissioner per meeting from $300 to $350 by resolution of the board. - Amends TCA Title 7, Chapter 82.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-17 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-28 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-13 - Senate - SENATE STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-28 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-13 - Senate - SENATE STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-08 | Pub. Ch. 915 | |
2018-05-08 | Effective date(s) 05/01/2018 | |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2018-04-19 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2018-04-17 | House | Passed H., Ayes 89, Nays 0, PNV 1 |
2018-04-17 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0746) |
2018-04-17 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2018-03-29 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0783) |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 3/28/2018 |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/13/2018 |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2136 (Crossfiled) 2018-05-08 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 915