TN HB2136 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 915
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 915
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, authorizes the board of commissioners of utility district in Blountville to increase the pay for each commissioner per meeting from $300 to $350 by resolution of the board. - Amends TCA Title 7, Chapter 82.
Title
As enacted, authorizes the board of commissioners of utility district in Blountville to increase the pay for each commissioner per meeting from $300 to $350 by resolution of the board. - Amends TCA Title 7, Chapter 82.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-08 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 915 | |
2018-04-17 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2018-04-10 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/17/2018 |
2018-04-10 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/10/2018 |
2018-04-03 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2018-03-28 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 4/3/2018 |
2018-03-28 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2018-03-21 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/28/2018 |
2018-03-21 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2018-02-28 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2018-02-21 | House | Placed on cal. Business and Utilities Committee for 2/28/2018 |
2018-02-20 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Business and Utilities Committee |
2018-02-14 | House | Placed on s/c cal Business and Utilities Subcommittee for 2/20/2018 |
2018-02-05 | House | Assigned to s/c Business and Utilities Subcommittee |
2018-02-05 | House | P2C, ref. to Business and Utilities Committee |
2018-02-01 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2018-01-31 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2043 (Crossfiled) 2018-05-08 - Pub. Ch. 915