TN SB2042 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 12 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-12 - Failed in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee / no motion
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 12 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-12 - Failed in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee / no motion
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires a commercial entity that knowingly publishes or distributes on the internet material harmful to minors to provide internet or cellular service subscribers the opportunity to request that the commercial entity block website access through the subscriber's internet or cellular service subscription. - Amends TCA Title 8, Chapter 6 and Title 47, Chapter 18.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 8, Chapter 6 and Title 47, Chapter 18, relative to material harmful to minors.
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Rose [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-12 | Senate | Failed in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee / no motion |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/12/2024 |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/12/2024 |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2024-01-29 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-01-25 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2160 (Crossfiled) 2024-03-12 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Banking & Consumer Affairs Subcommittee of Commerce Committee