TN SB2037 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-24 - Re-refer to Senate Cal. Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-24 - Re-refer to Senate Cal. Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, reduces lifetime handgun carry permit fee from $268 to $100 for military service members who retire after 20 years of military service with honorable discharge. - Amends TCA Section 39-17-1351.
Title
As introduced, reduces lifetime handgun carry permit fee from $268 to $100 for military service members who retire after 20 years of military service with honorable discharge. - Amends TCA Section 39-17-1351.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-18 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS, AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 1 PNV 0 (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-24 | Senate | Re-refer to Senate Cal. Comm. |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/24/2018 |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 4/24/2018 |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/23/2018 |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 1 PNV 0 |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/18/2018 |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/18/2018 |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/17/2018 |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/27/2018 |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2547 (Crossfiled) 2018-04-18 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee