TN SB2033 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-16 - Action deferred in Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-16 - Action deferred in Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires, in addition to the United States flag, that the official Tennessee state flag to be displayed on every public school building in this state; requires the commissioner of education to specify the size and quality of the official Tennessee state flags that school districts may purchase and to prescribe rules for the proper care, display, and observance of the official Tennessee state flag. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 6.
Title
As introduced, requires, in addition to the United States flag, that the official Tennessee state flag to be displayed on every public school building in this state; requires the commissioner of education to specify the size and quality of the official Tennessee state flags that school districts may purchase and to prescribe rules for the proper care, display, and observance of the official Tennessee state flag. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 6.
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Rose [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Education Committee |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/16/2020 |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Education Committee to 3/18/2020 |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/11/2020 |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1657 (Crossfiled) 2020-06-10 - Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 6/15/2020