TN SB2029 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 910
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 910
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires LEAs to provide written notice to a student's parents or legal guardians before the student participates in any mental health screening. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Title
As enacted, requires LEAs to provide written notice to a student's parents or legal guardians before the student participates in any mental health screening. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-14 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 6, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-08 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 910 | |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/18/2018 |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar 4/18/18 |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/17/2018 |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/16/2018 |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar 4/16/18 |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/12/2018 |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 4/12/2018 |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/11/2018 |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 4/9/2018 |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/4/2018 |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 4/4/2018 |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0794) |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 3/28/2018 |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 6, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/14/2018 |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Education Committee to 3/14/2018 |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/7/2018 |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2690 (Crossfiled) 2018-05-08 - Pub. Ch. 910