TN SB2021 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-03 - Pub. Ch. 970
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-03 - Pub. Ch. 970
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires a person convicted of manufacturing methamphetamine to serve at least 180 days in confinement and a person convicted of possession of methamphetamine to serve at least 30 days in confinement; specifies that the minimum mandatory sentences will not prohibit persons who are convicted of methamphetamine offenses from participating in a drug or recovery court and receiving sentence credit for up to the full amount of the mandatory minimum sentence. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 4.
Title
As enacted, requires a person convicted of manufacturing methamphetamine to serve at least 180 days in confinement and a person convicted of possession of methamphetamine to serve at least 30 days in confinement; specifies that the minimum mandatory sentences will not prohibit persons who are convicted of methamphetamine offenses from participating in a drug or recovery court and receiving sentence credit for up to the full amount of the mandatory minimum sentence. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 4.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-16 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-10 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-19 - Senate - S. H&W COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-11 - Senate - S. JUD COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. H&W Comm. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-11 - Senate - S. JUD COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. H&W Comm. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-10 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-19 - Senate - S. H&W COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-11 - Senate - S. JUD COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. H&W Comm. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-11 - Senate - S. JUD COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. H&W Comm. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-03 | House | Pub. Ch. 970 |
2014-06-03 | House | Effective date(s) 07/01/2014 |
2014-05-19 | House | Signed by Governor. |
2014-05-08 | House | Transmitted to Gov. for action. |
2014-05-07 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2014-05-01 | House | Signed by S. Speaker |
2014-04-24 | House | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2014-04-16 | House | Passed H., Ayes 89, Nays 0 |
2014-04-16 | House | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 2 - HA1311) |
2014-04-16 | House | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 1 - HA1039) |
2014-04-16 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Passed S. as am., Ayes 26, Nays 0, PNV 1 |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 1 - SA0803) |
2014-04-10 | Senate | S. adopted am.(Amendment 5 of 0 - SA1140) |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 4 - SA1107) |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 3 - SA1035) |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 2 - SA0995) |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 4/10/2014 |
2014-04-09 | Senate | S. Reset on Cal. for 4/10/2014 |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 4/9/2014 |
2014-04-03 | Senate | S. Reset on Cal. for 4/9/2014 |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 4/3/2014 |
2014-04-02 | Senate | S. Reset on Cal. for 4/3/2014 |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 4/2/2014 |
2014-03-31 | Senate | S. Reset on Cal. for 4/2/2014 |
2014-03-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 3/31/2014 |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Rec. for pass; ref to S. Cal. Comm. |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Placed on S. H&W Comm. cal. for 3/19/2014 |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. H&W Comm. Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 1 |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. H&W Comm. Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 3/11/2014 |
2014-01-27 | Senate | P2C, ref. to S. Jud Comm. |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Intro., P1C. |
2014-01-22 | Senate | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1661 (Crossfiled) 2014-06-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 970