TN HB1661 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 970
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 970
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires a person convicted of manufacturing methamphetamine to serve at least 180 days in confinement and a person convicted of possession of methamphetamine to serve at least 30 days in confinement; specifies that the minimum mandatory sentences will not prohibit persons who are convicted of methamphetamine offenses from participating in a drug or recovery court and receiving sentence credit for up to the full amount of the mandatory minimum sentence. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 4.
Title
As enacted, requires a person convicted of manufacturing methamphetamine to serve at least 180 days in confinement and a person convicted of possession of methamphetamine to serve at least 30 days in confinement; specifies that the minimum mandatory sentences will not prohibit persons who are convicted of methamphetamine offenses from participating in a drug or recovery court and receiving sentence credit for up to the full amount of the mandatory minimum sentence. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 4.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-15 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Regular Calendar 1 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-09 - House - (VOICE VOTE) FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-26 - House - (VOICE VOTE) HEALTH COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-12 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CRIMINAL JUSTICE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Health Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-04 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CRIMINAL JUSTICE SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Criminal Justice Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-09 - House - (VOICE VOTE) FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-26 - House - (VOICE VOTE) HEALTH COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-12 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CRIMINAL JUSTICE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Health Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-04 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CRIMINAL JUSTICE SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Criminal Justice Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-03 | House | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 970 |
2014-04-16 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2014-04-15 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/16/2014 |
2014-04-15 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/15/2014 |
2014-04-15 | House | Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee |
2014-04-14 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 4/15/2014 |
2014-04-14 | House | Rec. for pass. if am. by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2014-04-09 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/9/2014 |
2014-04-08 | House | Placed Behind the Budget |
2014-04-02 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/8/2014 |
2014-03-28 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2014-03-26 | House | Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2014-03-19 | House | Placed on cal. Health Committee for 3/26/2014 |
2014-03-12 | House | Rec. for Pass. ref. to: Health Committee |
2014-03-05 | House | Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 3/12/2014 |
2014-03-04 | House | Rec. for pass. if am. by s/c ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2014-02-26 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/4/2014 |
2014-01-23 | House | Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2014-01-23 | House | P2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee--Health |
2014-01-22 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2014-01-16 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2021 (Crossfiled) 2014-06-03 - Pub. Ch. 970