TN SB2012 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Passed on May 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-18 - Pub. Ch. 936
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, requires the state board of education to develop a policy for transmittal of final disciplinary actions on educator licenses to the national clearinghouse administered by the National Association of State Directors of Teacher Education and Certification (NASDTEC); requires the state board to post on its website all of its final disciplinary actions on educator licenses. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 1; Title 49, Chapter 2 and Title 49, Chapter 5.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, requires the state board of education to develop a policy for transmittal of final disciplinary actions on educator licenses to the national clearinghouse administered by the National Association of State Directors of Teacher Education and Certification (NASDTEC); requires the state board to post on its website all of its final disciplinary actions on educator licenses. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 1; Title 49, Chapter 2 and Title 49, Chapter 5.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-19 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-26 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-21 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-18 Pub. Ch. 936
2018-05-18 Effective date(s) 05/15/2018
2018-05-15SenateSigned by Governor.
2018-05-07SenateTransmitted to Governor for action.
2018-04-24HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2018-04-23SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2018-04-23SenateEnrolled and ready for signatures
2018-04-19HousePassed H., Ayes 87, Nays 0, PNV 0
2018-04-19HouseSubst. for comp. HB.
2018-03-01HouseRcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
2018-02-27SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2018-02-26SenatePassed Senate, Ayes 30, Nays 0
2018-02-23SenatePlaced on Senate Consent Calendar 2 calendar for 2/26/2018
2018-02-21SenateRecommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
2018-02-15SenatePlaced on Senate Education Committee calendar for 2/21/2018
2018-02-01SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee
2018-01-31SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2018-01-30SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB2099 (Crossfiled) 2018-05-18 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 936

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback