TN SB2011 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Passed on May 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-18 - Pub. Ch. 935
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, requires a director of schools, director of public charter school, or director of a nonpublic school who learns of the conviction of a licensed educator employed by the LEA for certain offenses to report the conviction to the state board; authorizes the state board to reprimand such a director for failure to report; enacts other related provisions. - Amends TCA Title 8 and Title 49.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, requires a director of schools, director of public charter school, or director of a nonpublic school who learns of the conviction of a licensed educator employed by the LEA for certain offenses to report the conviction to the state board; authorizes the state board to reprimand such a director for failure to report; enacts other related provisions. - Amends TCA Title 8 and Title 49.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-19 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PREVIOUS QUESTION PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 64 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-19 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 79 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-19 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PREVIOUS QUESTION PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 59 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-01 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-21 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-18 Pub. Ch. 935
2018-05-18 Effective date(s) 05/15/2018; 07/01/2018
2018-05-15SenateSigned by Governor.
2018-05-07SenateTransmitted to Governor for action.
2018-04-24HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2018-04-23SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2018-04-23SenateEnrolled and ready for signatures
2018-04-19HousePassed H., Ayes 79, Nays 8, PNV 1
2018-04-19HouseAm. withdrawn. (Amendment 2 - HA0977)
2018-04-19HouseAm. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0923)
2018-04-19HouseSubst. for comp. HB.
2018-03-05HouseRcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
2018-03-01SenateSponsor(s) Added.
2018-03-01SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2018-03-01SenatePassed Senate as amended, Ayes 28, Nays 0
2018-03-01SenateSenate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0622)
2018-02-27SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 3/1/2018
2018-02-21SenateRecommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
2018-02-15SenatePlaced on Senate Education Committee calendar for 2/21/2018
2018-02-01SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee
2018-01-31SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2018-01-30SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB2009 (Crossfiled) 2018-05-18 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 935

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback