TN SB2002 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-26 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-26 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires official vintage license plates that are issued and registered by the state in lieu of the standard antique motor vehicle registration plate to be displayed on antique motor vehicles when they are being operated on public roads and highways or are stationary; allows holders of standard antique motor vehicle registration plates to display unofficial, unregistered vintage license plates only when the vehicle is stationary; requires such holders to display the standard plate while the vehicle is being operated on public roads and highways. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 4, Part 1 and Title 55, Chapter 4, Part 2.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 55, Chapter 4, Part 1 and Title 55, Chapter 4, Part 2, relative to antique motor vehicles.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-26 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - Senate - TRANSPORTATION AND SAFETY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - Senate - TRANSPORTATION AND SAFETY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-26 | Effective date(s) 07/01/2024 | |
2024-03-26 | Pub. Ch. 569 | |
2024-03-15 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2024-03-06 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2024-03-04 | House | Passed H., Ayes 96, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2024-03-04 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2024-02-29 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 32, Nays 0 |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2024-02-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 2/26/2024 |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Transportation and Safety Committee calendar for 2/21/2024 |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Transportation and Safety Committee |
2024-01-29 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-01-25 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2305 (Crossfiled) 2024-03-26 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 569