TN SB1999 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-16 - Pub. Ch. 880
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-16 - Pub. Ch. 880
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires the coordinator of elections and the state election commission to certify each voter registration system for purchase and use in the state; provides that the voter registration list is the property of the county election commission and the state; restricts the use of certain voter registration information; provides penalty for the unauthorized use of certain voter registration information. - Amends TCA Section 2-2-137 and Section 2-2-138.
Title
As enacted, requires the coordinator of elections and the state election commission to certify each voter registration system for purchase and use in the state; provides that the voter registration list is the property of the county election commission and the state; restricts the use of certain voter registration information; provides penalty for the unauthorized use of certain voter registration information. - Amends TCA Section 2-2-137 and Section 2-2-138.
Sponsors
Sen. Ken Yager [R] | Rep. Dennis Powers [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-04-14 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-31 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-25 - Senate - S. S&L GOVT. COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-31 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-25 - Senate - S. S&L GOVT. COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-16 | House | Pub. Ch. 880 |
2014-05-16 | House | Effective date(s) 05/01/2014 |
2014-05-01 | House | Signed by Governor. |
2014-04-23 | House | Transmitted to Gov. for action. |
2014-04-17 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2014-04-16 | House | Signed by S. Speaker |
2014-04-15 | House | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2014-04-14 | House | Passed H., Ayes 91, Nays 0 |
2014-04-14 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Passed S., Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2014-03-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 cal. for 3/31/2014 |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: S. Cal. Comm. |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 3/25/2014 |
2014-01-27 | Senate | P2C, ref. to S. S&L Govt. Comm. |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Intro., P1C. |
2014-01-22 | Senate | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2320 (Crossfiled) 2014-05-16 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 880